Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bruce L Gause Ii, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Carson, Craig Diallo, against Damara A Brown, represented by Welch, Warren, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, NY, . Monroe County, NY Superior Courts with John B Gallagher presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn B Gallagher Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 03, 2019 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedMay 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMonroe County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2022 |
FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW Contains SSN Redacted per 22 NYCRR Contains SSN Redacted |
||
February 16, 2022 |
JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE Contains SSN |
||
February 15, 2022 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW (PROPOSED) | ||
February 15, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) | ||
October 01, 2021 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) | ||
October 01, 2021 | PART 130 CERTIFICATION | ||
October 01, 2021 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW (PROPOSED) | ||
September 30, 2021 | QUALIFIED MEDICAL CHILD SUPPORT ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
September 28, 2021 | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | ||
September 28, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.