Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Phillip Bryant, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Carson, Craig Diallo, against Deborah A Bryant, represented by Indralingam, Rebecca Anne, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, NY, . Monroe County, NY Superior Courts with John B Gallagher presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn B Gallagher Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2019 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
|
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions2 days |
Filing LocationMonroe County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time2 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2021 |
JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE Contains SSN |
||
May 20, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
May 20, 2021 | REFEREE REPORT - ATTORNEY | ||
May 20, 2021 |
QUALIFIED MEDICAL CHILD SUPPORT ORDER Contains SSN Redacted per 22 NYCRR Contains SSN Redacted |
||
May 20, 2021 |
FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW Contains SSN Redacted per 22 NYCRR Contains SSN Redacted |
||
April 22, 2021 | QUALIFIED MEDICAL CHILD SUPPORT ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
April 15, 2021 | SEPARATION AGREEMENT | ||
February 17, 2021 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
February 17, 2021 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW (PROPOSED) | ||
February 17, 2021 | PART 130 CERTIFICATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.