Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Cheswold, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case against County Of Monroe, Donald G Kepler, Doris T Kepler, John Doe #1 Through John Doe #20, Stanley L Grant, (total of 7) See All represented by Costello, Mark A, Zacharias, Michael John, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, NY, . Monroe County, NY Superior Courts with Daniel J Doyle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel J Doyle Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 12, 2014 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedDecember 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationMonroe County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: August 12, 2014EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 12, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2021 | ORDER - AMENDED | ||
March 08, 2021 |
ORDER - OTHER Order for Distribution of Surplus Money |
||
February 26, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #5) Exhibit to Docket 15 - Buck Affidavit |
||
February 26, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #5) Buck Affidavit re surplus monies |
||
February 26, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #5) Costello Affidavit re surplus monies |
||
February 17, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 12, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #5) Print Out from Monroe County Treasurer's Office |
||
February 12, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
February 12, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #5) Referee's Report of Sale |
||
February 12, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #5) Payoff Quote |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.