Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Japheth N Otiso, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Feldberg, Anna Naomi, against Cynthia D Otiso, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, NY, . Monroe County, NY Superior Courts with Sam Valleriani presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSam Valleriani Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 25, 2012 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedMay 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMonroe County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
August 24, 2021 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
January 25, 2021 | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
January 15, 2021 | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
January 11, 2021 | CONSENT TO EFILING | ||
May 25, 2012 | COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.