Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Dhd Ventures New York, Llc, One Flint St. Llc, filed a(n) Toxic,Environmental - Torts case represented by Kendall, Amy K., Knauf, Alan Jon, against 15 Flint Street, Inc, Exxon Mobile Corporation, Exxonmobil Oil Corporation, Genesee Scrap & Tin Baling Co., Inc, Hy Lazerson & Sons, Inc D B A Rochester Scrap Baling Company, (total of 11) See All represented by Cook, David L., Obrien, Donald W, Siclari, Laura A., in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, NY, . Monroe County, NY Superior Courts with Elena F Cariola presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElena F Cariola Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 11, 2011 |
CategoryTorts - Environmental (Navigation Law Article 12) |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMonroe County, NY |
Matter TypeToxic,Environmental |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: June 23, 2022CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: September 02, 2021COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: April 11, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2023 | ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING | ||
July 18, 2022 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY | ||
June 23, 2022 |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance for David L. Cook |
||
June 23, 2022 |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance for Kevin English |
||
March 22, 2022 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
December 17, 2021 | ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING | ||
September 02, 2021 | CONSENT TO EFILING | ||
April 11, 2011 | COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.