Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Snir B C1 Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Shur, Joseph M, against John Frame, Rochester Performance Euro, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, NY, . Monroe County, NY Superior Courts with Stacey Romeo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStacey Romeo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMonroe County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 07, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 18, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: October 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2021 | Affidavit of Compliance - corp | ||
November 18, 2021 | Affidavit of Facts | ||
November 18, 2021 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
November 18, 2021 | Affidavit of Compliance - Ind | ||
November 16, 2021 |
ORDER - AWARDING FEE Atty Fees |
||
October 28, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION Attorney Affirmation |
||
October 28, 2021 | RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION | ||
October 28, 2021 |
EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) order for attorneys fees |
||
September 23, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Sheriff |
||
September 17, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Secretary of State |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.