Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mcerin Novelty Corp. D B A Rochester Premier Remodeling, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Stephen Mendola, represented by Rose, Angelo Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, NY, . Monroe County, NY Superior Courts with Vincent M Dinolfo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVincent M Dinolfo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMonroe County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2023 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
December 22, 2021 | DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS | ||
December 22, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
December 22, 2021 | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION | ||
December 22, 2021 | DEMAND FOR: | ||
November 17, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
November 17, 2021 | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION | ||
October 04, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 03, 2021 | COMPLAINT | ||
September 03, 2021 | SUMMONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.