Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Amber James, Amber Johnson, Annalisa Barron, Breyana Clark, Bridget Strub, (total of 41) See All filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Dolby-Shields, Elliot, Roth, Audra R, against Gerald Ludwig, Michael Koerner, The City Of Rochester, Todd Baxter, represented by Clark, Adam M., Noone, Christopher Stephen, Rodi, Maria E, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, NY, . Monroe County, NY Superior Courts with Daniel J Doyle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel J Doyle Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Police Misconduct) |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMonroe County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 02, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 29, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2023 | ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING | ||
May 17, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
May 09, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
March 24, 2023 | DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS | ||
March 24, 2023 | NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION | ||
March 24, 2023 | DEMAND FOR: | ||
March 13, 2023 | ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING | ||
December 06, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B City's 12-5-22 letter |
||
December 06, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
December 06, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Plaintiffs' proposed scheduling order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.