Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Verhagen, Jason Peter, against Mary Kruzinski Aka Mary P Kruzinski, Mary Kruzinski Aka Mary P Kruzinski, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, NY, . Monroe County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMonroe County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 11, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 29, 2021NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: July 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2023 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
July 06, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 06, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 22, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 22, 2021 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | ||
August 02, 2021 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION | ||
June 29, 2021 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHO FORM |
||
June 29, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE - MARY KRUZINSKI AKA MARY P KRUZINSKI |
||
June 11, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
June 11, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.