Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Miguel Andaluz, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Parisi, Albert, against John Doe, Regional Transit Service, Regional Transit Service Incorporated A K A Rochester Genesee Regional Transportation District Incorporated, And, Rochester Genesee Regional Transportation Authority, represented by Vahey, Laurie Ann, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, NY, . Monroe County, NY Superior Courts with Elena F Cariola presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElena F Cariola Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 10, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMonroe County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 10, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
June 16, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
July 06, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
June 22, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE service on RGRTA |
||
June 10, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.