Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Hughes, Adam Michael, against Sunny N Mccoy, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, NY, . Monroe County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 09, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMonroe County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 09, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: January 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: January 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 21, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
January 21, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 default notice |
||
January 21, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
January 21, 2022 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
November 05, 2021 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | ||
July 12, 2021 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION | ||
June 30, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
June 30, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
June 09, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.