Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Jefferson Capital Systems, Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Florio, Michael James, Garbus, Mark A, Leiderman, Joel D, against Kristine R Cody, Scott Cody, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, NY, . Monroe County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 07, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedDecember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMonroe County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 07, 2021AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 08, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2023 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
October 08, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted |
||
October 08, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted |
||
October 08, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
||
October 08, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION NON MILTARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR NON MILTARY Redacted |
||
October 08, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT Redacted per 22 NYCRR JUDGMENT Redacted |
||
July 23, 2021 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION | ||
July 18, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
July 18, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
June 07, 2021 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT FZLC948028A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.