Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Anne Reynolds, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Little, Patrick Allan, against John Cassidy, represented by Culliton, Alyson C, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, NY, . Monroe County, NY Superior Courts with Daniel J Doyle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel J Doyle Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMonroe County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 13, 2021ANSWER
Date: February 02, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 25, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2023 |
NOTICE OF APPEAL (Motion #1) Notice of Appeal with Decision and Order |
||
March 03, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Notice of Entry with Decision and Order |
||
March 02, 2023 | ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT | ||
February 07, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
February 07, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Reply Affirmation in further support of Defendants motion |
||
February 07, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) Reply Memorandum of Law |
||
January 31, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #1) RGH MEDICAL RECORDS |
||
January 31, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #1) MRI REPORT |
||
January 31, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #1) MRI OF CERVICAL SPINE |
||
January 31, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - S (Motion #1) BELL DEFENSE IME REPORT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.