Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Deery, Elizabeth Emily, Maida, Stephanie Marie, Verhagen, Jason Peter, against David Biocca Aka David M Biocca, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, NY, . Monroe County, NY Superior Courts with Victoria M Argento presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVictoria M Argento Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMonroe County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 11, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 15, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 22, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2023 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT) | ||
December 29, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION Attorney Affirmation to Explain Address |
||
December 29, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
December 29, 2022 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Judgment |
||
December 29, 2022 | Affidavit of Facts | ||
December 29, 2022 | Affidavit of Military Investigation | ||
December 29, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION Statute of Limitations |
||
December 29, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215g |
||
December 29, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Invoice |
||
December 06, 2022 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.