Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Laquanda Brown, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Adams, Jennifer Lynne, Ingersoll, Timothy Edward, against Travis Brown, represented by Wieser, John Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, NY, . Monroe County, NY Superior Courts with John B Gallagher presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn B Gallagher Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 08, 2020 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedFebruary 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMonroe County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 18, 2022 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
January 13, 2022 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) | ||
October 22, 2021 |
FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW Contains SSN Redacted per 22 NYCRR Contains SSN Redacted |
||
October 22, 2021 |
JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE Contains SSN |
||
October 20, 2021 | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | ||
June 04, 2021 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW (PROPOSED) | ||
June 04, 2021 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) | ||
June 02, 2021 | COMPLAINT | ||
June 02, 2021 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.