Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, NY, . Monroe County, NY Superior Courts with Taddeo, Hon. Ann Marie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTaddeo, Hon. Ann Marie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management329 days |
Filing DateFebruary 11, 2016 |
CategoryTort-Motor Vehicle |
Time To Trial559 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationMonroe County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time671 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2016 | Hearing |
Discontinued Marie Taddeo (Court Activity) Judge: Taddeo, Hon. Ann Marie |
|
June 15, 2016 | Hearing |
Trial Ended Marie Taddeo (Trial Part) Judge: Taddeo, Hon. Ann Marie |
|
June 14, 2016 | Motion |
(Motion #002) Decided: 06/14/2016Decided Before Justice: Taddeo, Hon. Ann Marie Answer demanded: No Judge: Taddeo, Hon. Ann Marie |
|
June 14, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #002) Marie Taddeo (Motion Part) Judge: Taddeo, Hon. Ann Marie |
|
June 14, 2016 | Hearing |
Return/Submit (Motion #002) Marie Taddeo (Motion Part) Judge: Taddeo, Hon. Ann Marie |
|
June 14, 2016 | Hearing |
Motion Filed (Motion #002) Marie Taddeo (Motion Part) Judge: Taddeo, Hon. Ann Marie |
|
June 14, 2016 | Hearing |
Trial Set For Marie Taddeo (Trial Part) Judge: Taddeo, Hon. Ann Marie |
|
June 14, 2016 | Hearing |
Trial Commenced Marie Taddeo (Trial Part) Judge: Taddeo, Hon. Ann Marie |
|
June 14, 2016 | Hearing |
Jury Drawn Marie Taddeo (Trial Part) Judge: Taddeo, Hon. Ann Marie |
|
June 13, 2016 | Hearing |
Trial Set For Marie Taddeo (Trial Part) Judge: Taddeo, Hon. Ann Marie |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.