Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, NY, . Monroe County, NY Superior Courts with Elma A. Bellini presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElma A. Bellini Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 26, 2013 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationMonroe County, NY |
|
Case Cycle Time308 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 24, 2013 | Hearing |
Trial Set For Bellini (Trial Part) Judge: Bellini, Hon. Elma A. |
|
July 31, 2013 | Hearing |
Post-Judgment Bellini (Court Activity) Judge: Bellini, Hon. Elma A. |
|
May 01, 2013 | Hearing |
Return/Submit (Motion #001) Bellini (Motion Part) Judge: Bellini, Hon. Elma A. |
|
May 01, 2013 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Bellini (Motion Part) Judge: Bellini, Hon. Elma A. |
|
April 23, 2013 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Bellini (Motion Part) Judge: Bellini, Hon. Elma A. |
|
April 23, 2013 | Hearing |
Held Bellini (Pre-Trial Conference) Judge: Bellini, Hon. Elma A. |
|
April 04, 2013 | Hearing |
Motion Filed (Motion #001) Bellini (Motion Part) Judge: Bellini, Hon. Elma A. |
|
April 04, 2013 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 05/01/2013Decided Before Justice: Bellini, Hon. Elma A. Answer demanded: No Judge: Bellini, Hon. Elma A. |
|
February 26, 2013 | Hearing |
Note of Issue Filed Bellini (Court Activity) Judge: Bellini, Hon. Elma A. |
|
December 03, 2012 | Hearing |
Preliminary Conference Bellini (Prelim. Conference) Judge: Bellini, Hon. Elma A. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.