Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, NY, . Monroe County, NY Superior Courts with Odorisi, Hon. J. Scott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOdorisi, Hon. J. Scott Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2016 |
CategoryComm-Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMonroe County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Cycle Time150 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided Scott Odorisi (Court Activity) Judge: Odorisi, Hon. J. Scott |
|
June 01, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Scott Odorisi (Motion Part) Judge: Odorisi, Hon. J. Scott |
|
June 01, 2016 | Hearing |
Return/Submit (Motion #001) Scott Odorisi (Motion Part) Judge: Odorisi, Hon. J. Scott |
|
May 03, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Scott Odorisi (Motion Part) Judge: Odorisi, Hon. J. Scott |
|
March 22, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Scott Odorisi (Motion Part) Judge: Odorisi, Hon. J. Scott |
|
January 29, 2016 | Hearing |
Transferred from IAS Justice Rosenbaum (Court Activity) Judge: Rosenbaum, Hon. Matthew A. |
|
January 26, 2016 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 06/01/2016Decided Before Justice: Odorisi, Hon. J. Scott Answer demanded: No Judge: Odorisi, Hon. J. Scott |
|
January 26, 2016 | Hearing |
Motion Filed (Motion #001) Scott Odorisi (Motion Part) Judge: Odorisi, Hon. J. Scott |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.