Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, NY, . Monroe County, NY Superior Courts with Odorisi, Hon. J. Scott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOdorisi, Hon. J. Scott Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2016 |
CategoryRp-Tax Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMonroe County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time986 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 18, 2018 | Hearing |
Withdrawn (Motion #001) Foreclosure Special Term Judge: Odorisi, Hon. J. Scott |
|
August 22, 2018 | Motion |
Disbursements (Motion #001) Decided: 09/17/2018Withdrawn Before Justice: Odorisi, Hon. J. Scott Answer demanded: No Judge: Odorisi, Hon. J. Scott |
|
June 08, 2016 | Hearing |
Marked Off Taylor (Court Activity) Judge: Taylor, Hon. William K. |
|
January 06, 2016 | Hearing |
Transferred from IAS Justice Minarik (Court Activity) Judge: Minarik, Hon. Renee Forgensi |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.