Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, NY, . Monroe County, NY Superior Courts with Doyle, Hon. Daniel J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDoyle, Hon. Daniel J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 05, 2014 |
CategoryRp-Mortgage Foreclosure-Residential |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMonroe County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time293 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2014 | Hearing |
Discontinued Donofrio (Court Activity) Judge: Donofrio, Hon. Gail A. |
|
April 02, 2014 | Hearing |
Donofrio (Settlement Conference)
Judge: Donofrio, Hon. Gail A. |
|
March 05, 2014 | Hearing |
Donofrio (Settlement Conference)
Judge: Donofrio, Hon. Gail A. |
|
November 21, 2013 | Hearing |
Settled - Loan Modification Doyle (Settlement Conference) Judge: Doyle, Hon. Daniel J. |
|
September 26, 2013 | Hearing |
Continued Doyle (Settlement Conference) Judge: Doyle, Hon. Daniel J. |
|
June 18, 2013 | Hearing |
Continued Doyle (Settlement Conference) Judge: Doyle, Hon. Daniel J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.