Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Crown Asset Management Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Poulin, Anthony Scott, against Tabatha L Miller, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, NY, . Madison County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMadison County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
April 06, 2023 | AFFIRMATION | ||
April 06, 2023 | Affidavit of Facts and Purchase of Acct by Debt Buyer Plaintiff | ||
April 06, 2023 | Affidavit of Facts and Sale of Acct by Orig Cred | ||
April 06, 2023 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
April 06, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 07, 2023 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
February 01, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 10, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
January 10, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.