Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Capital One, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Hughes, Adam Michael, against Joe Klein, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, NY, . Madison County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2022 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMadison County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 20, 2022ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT
Date: January 18, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2023 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
March 09, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
March 07, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
March 07, 2023 | AFFIRMATION | ||
March 07, 2023 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
January 18, 2023 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
January 11, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 11, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
December 20, 2022 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.