Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Citizens Bank, Na F K A Rbs Citizens Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Sposato, Melissa A., against Clerk Of Madison County, Donna Snow As Heir At Law And Next Of Kin To David H. Gowdy, John Doe #1" To "John Doe #10,The Last 10 Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff, The Persons Or Parties Intended Being The Persons Or Parties, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises Described In The Complaint Et Al, John Doe And Jane Doe 1 Through 50, Intending To Be The Unknown Heirs, Distributees, Devisees, Grantees, Trustees, Lienors, Creditors, And Assignees Of The Estate Of David H. Gowdy, Who Was Born In 1944 And Died On September 7, 2019, A Resident Of Onondaga County, New York State Department Of Taxation And Finance, (total of 8) See All represented by Lesperance, Karen Folster, Wayland-Smith, Tina Marie, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, NY, . Madison County, NY Superior Courts with Patrick O'Sullivan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatrick O'Sullivan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 08, 2022 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMadison County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
John Doe #1" To "John Doe #10,The Last 10 Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff, The Persons Or Parties Intended Being The Persons Or Parties, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises Described In The Complaint Et Al
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: November 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 21, 2023OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: November 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 27, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
November 27, 2023 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
November 21, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of service for RJI |
||
November 21, 2023 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
November 21, 2023 | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
March 01, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM DONNA SNOW AS HEIR AT LAW AND NEXT OF KIN TO DAVID H. GOWDY |
||
March 01, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS DONNA SNOW AS HEIR AT LAW AND NEXT OF KIN TO DAVID H. GOWDY |
||
February 15, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE |
||
February 10, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS WENDY S. LOUGNOT AS PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF DAVID H. GOWDY |
||
February 10, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS JOHN DOE AND JANE DOE 1 THROUGH 50, INTENDING TO BE THE UNKNOWN HEIRS, DISTRIBUTEES, DEVISEE, GR AOS JOHN DOE AND JANE DOE 1 THROUGH 50, INTENDING TO BE THE UNKNOWN HEIRS, DISTRIBUTEES, DEVISEE, GR ... show more |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.