Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Kristi Musacchio, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Cerio, Marian Judith, against Michael Musacchio Jr, represented by Rapasadi, Kathleen A., in the jurisdiction of Madison County, NY, . Madison County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 06, 2022 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedFebruary 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMadison County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 16, 2022 | EXHIBIT(S) | ||
October 04, 2022 | EXHIBIT(S) | ||
October 04, 2022 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
August 11, 2022 | REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) | ||
August 05, 2022 | ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) | ||
August 05, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
July 07, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 06, 2022 | APPENDIX | ||
July 06, 2022 | SWORN STATEMENT OF REMOVAL OF BARRIERS TO REMARRIAGE | ||
July 06, 2022 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.