Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Nbt Bank, National Association As Successor By Merger To Alliance Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Burgess, Peter Landon, against Carrie Gapski As Administrator Of The Estate Of Anne E. Loomis, Oneida Healthcare Center, The Estate Of Anne E. Loomis, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, NY, . Madison County, NY Superior Courts Supreme with Patrick O'Sullivan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatrick O'Sullivan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 10, 2022 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedApril 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMadison County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This complaint is a legal document filed by NBT Bank, National Association, as the successor to Alliance Bank, N.A. The defendants in this case are the Estate of Anne E. Loomis, Carrie Gapski as the administrator of the Estate of Anne E. Loomis, Onei...
NOTICE OF SALE
Date: April 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 05, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION
Date: May 31, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 05, 2023OATH
Date: April 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 29, 2022JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 29, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 29, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 29, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 29, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 29, 2022OATH
Date: December 22, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: December 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 29, 2022ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 29, 2022REFEREE REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE
Date: December 22, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 29, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 29, 2022ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 29, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 26, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 13, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 29, 2022NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: June 10, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 10, 2022REFEREE REPORT OF SALE
Date: July 20, 2023FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM
Date: July 20, 2023OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: April 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 29, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2023 |
REFEREE REPORT OF SALE Referee's Report of Sale |
||
July 20, 2023 | Foreclosure Action Surplus Monies Form | ||
May 31, 2023 | Affidavit of Publication - Oneida Daily Dispatch | ||
May 05, 2023 | Affidavit of Posting - Village of Wampsville | ||
May 05, 2023 | Affidavit of Posting - City of Oneida | ||
April 13, 2023 | Notice of Sale & Terms of Sale | ||
April 13, 2023 |
OATH Referee's Oath |
||
April 05, 2023 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE |
||
December 29, 2022 | Affidavit of Service | ||
December 29, 2022 |
JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) (Motion #2) Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale (Proposed) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.