Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Cedar Valley Campsite, Llc, Cedar Valley Properties, Llc, Paul Moller, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Benedict, Timothy A., Tompkins, Jeffrey Glen, against Cedar Valley Campsite, Llc, Cedar Valley Properties, Llc, Denise Haller, represented by Hobika, Joseph Habib, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, NY, . Madison County, NY Superior Courts with Patrick O'Sullivan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatrick O'Sullivan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 28, 2022 |
CategoryCommercial - Business Entity |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMadison County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: April 28, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 10, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED
Date: May 12, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 13, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 03, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 22, 2023OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: May 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: April 28, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: April 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: April 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: April 28, 2022PETITION
Date: April 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: April 28, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: April 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: April 28, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
May 03, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
May 03, 2023 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ORDER |
||
July 13, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
June 10, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
May 12, 2022 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED | ||
April 29, 2022 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
April 28, 2022 | RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
April 28, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 CV Properties LLC --operating agreement |
||
April 28, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 Campsite LLC--Operation Agreement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.