Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Rothman, Keith H, against Carolye Mahar, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, NY, . Madison County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 26, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMadison County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 26, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: November 12, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: November 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 12, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT UPDATED REVIEW SHEET |
||
November 12, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 11, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR R&R FILE # 1407054 | ||
November 11, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1407054 |
||
November 11, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT R&R FILE # 1407054 |
||
November 11, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1407054 |
||
September 28, 2021 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
September 22, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 22, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
August 26, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.