Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lena May Smith, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Rapasadi, Kathleen A., against Ronald Daniel Smith Jr., in the jurisdiction of Madison County, NY, . Madison County, NY Superior Courts with Donald F Cerio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonald F Cerio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 25, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMadison County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2022 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
January 27, 2022 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | ||
January 25, 2022 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | ||
December 13, 2021 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
December 13, 2021 | EXHIBIT(S) | ||
December 13, 2021 | RETAINER AGREEMENT | ||
November 30, 2021 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
November 29, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
November 08, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 25, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.