Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Richard Andrew Messineo Iii, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Carr, David Michael, Santoro, Jeffrey Paul, against Kimber L Messineo, represented by Kalil, Michael Namtalla, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, NY, . Madison County, NY Superior Courts with Donald F Cerio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonald F Cerio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 16, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedFebruary 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMadison County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2023 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
February 01, 2023 | EXHIBIT(S) | ||
February 01, 2023 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
January 18, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
January 12, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 12, 2023 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | ||
January 10, 2023 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | ||
January 06, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
November 21, 2022 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
November 19, 2021 | RETAINER AGREEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.