Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Esl Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Connors, Mary Mcauley, against Kurt J. Betters, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, NY, . Madison County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 11, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMadison County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 11, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 16, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2022 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
January 04, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Service Invoice |
||
January 04, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 Non-Military Affirmation and Search |
||
January 04, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 Notice of Payment Default |
||
January 04, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Attorney Affirmation |
||
January 04, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 Affidavit of Mailing Notice of Default |
||
January 04, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
September 28, 2021 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | ||
August 17, 2021 | Affidavit of Mailing | ||
August 16, 2021 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.