Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Michael P. Klenotiz, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Martin-Grande, Diane Marie, against Lisa M. Klenotiz, represented by Digiorgio, Peter Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, NY, . Madison County, NY Superior Courts with Patrick O'Sullivan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatrick O'Sullivan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 10, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedFebruary 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMadison County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2022 | EXHIBIT(S) | ||
November 15, 2022 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
November 15, 2022 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | ||
May 26, 2022 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
May 25, 2022 | MATRIMONIAL ADDENDUM (840M) | ||
May 25, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
October 26, 2021 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
September 15, 2021 | ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) | ||
August 18, 2021 | EXHIBIT(S) | ||
August 18, 2021 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.