Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Barreto, Jonathan Alexander, Gavlik, Amy, Sheerin, John J, Valle, Jonathan Irving, against Donna Marie Rugino, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, NY, . Madison County, NY Superior Courts with Patrick O'Sullivan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatrick O'Sullivan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 28, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedNovember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMadison County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 28, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 28, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: June 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2023 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) | ||
June 16, 2023 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ORDER |
||
June 12, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) letter withdrawing motion |
||
June 01, 2023 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
May 26, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #1) proposed order |
||
May 26, 2023 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
May 26, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) SETTLEMENT STIPULATION |
||
May 26, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) affidavit of service and blueback |
||
May 26, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #1) PAYMENT HISTORY |
||
May 26, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #1) Notice of default letter and AOS Notice of default letter and AOS Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.