Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Midland Credit Management Inc., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Poulin, Anthony Scott, against Hang Do, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, NY, . Madison County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 13, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJuly 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMadison County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 13, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 13, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 14, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: February 15, 2022JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: February 14, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: February 15, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 02, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: February 14, 2022ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT
Date: August 06, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
February 15, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT UPDATED REVIEW SHEET |
||
February 14, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 14, 2022 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) TMP#424153 |
||
February 14, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
August 06, 2021 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
August 02, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 13, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
July 13, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.