Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Abasse Ouedraogo, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Centeno, David, against Savonne Janiece Brock A.K.A. Bock Janiece Savonne, Savonne Janiece Brock A.K.A. Bock Janiece Savonne, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, NY, . Madison County, NY Superior Courts with Donald F Cerio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonald F Cerio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 08, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedMarch 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMadison County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
October 26, 2021 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
October 26, 2021 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - SIGNED | ||
October 22, 2021 | Hearing |
POST-JUDGEMENT CERIO, JR. (Court Activity) Judge: HON. DONALD F. CERIO, JR. |
|
August 25, 2021 | NOTICE | ||
August 25, 2021 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
August 24, 2021 | RJI -RE: UNCONTESTED MATRIMONIAL ACTION | ||
August 24, 2021 | COMPLAINT | ||
August 24, 2021 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | ||
August 24, 2021 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.