Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Synchrony Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Slamowitz, Mitchell G, against Melanie Baickle, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, NY, . Madison County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 12, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMadison County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 12, 2021NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: August 31, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 09, 2021STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: December 22, 2021ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT
Date: June 14, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2022 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
December 22, 2021 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | ||
June 14, 2021 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
June 09, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
June 09, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
May 12, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.