Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Rothman, Keith H, against Jennifer E Meeker, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, NY, . Madison County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 29, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMadison County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 29, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: August 06, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 31, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT UPDATED REVIEW SHEET |
||
August 09, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
August 06, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT R&R FILE # 1387165 |
||
August 06, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1387165 |
||
August 06, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION AOM AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1387165 |
||
August 06, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR R&R FILE # 1387165 | ||
August 06, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1387165 |
||
June 07, 2021 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
May 31, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
May 31, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.