Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Midland Credit Management, Inc., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Poulin, Anthony Scott, against Sean Dillon, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, NY, . Madison County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 23, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMadison County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 23, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 23, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 06, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
July 05, 2022 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
June 03, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OCA AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR OCA AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
||
June 03, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT UPDATED REVIEW SHEET |
||
June 03, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
April 04, 2022 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
February 16, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
February 16, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 16, 2022 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected* TMP#414085 |
||
May 11, 2021 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM - PVEF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.