Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Goldman Sachs Bank Usa, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Maida, Stephanie Marie, Powell, Larry T, Verhagen, Jason P, against Kari Skinner, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, NY, . Madison County, NY Superior Courts with Patrick O'Sullivan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatrick O'Sullivan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 21, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedOctober 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMadison County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: April 21, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: April 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
February 08, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 08, 2023 |
NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) *Corrected* Notice of Discontinuance |
||
December 15, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ORDER |
||
September 28, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #01) Notice of Court Date w/Affidavit of Mailing |
||
September 28, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 23, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT RJI |
||
September 23, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #01) POSTAL VERIFICATION |
||
September 23, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #01) AFF OF NON-SERVICE |
||
September 23, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #01) PROPERTY RECORDS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.