Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ricky A. Torres, Rosa L. Torres, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Julian, Robert F., Marmanillo, Nicole Ursula, Palmer, Stephanie Ann, against Cheryl E. Bonn, Deron J. Coulon, represented by Hamberger, Douglas Paul, Vincent, Pierre A., in the jurisdiction of Madison County, NY, . Madison County, NY Superior Courts with Patrick O'Sullivan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatrick O'Sullivan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMadison County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 11, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 23, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: February 23, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 01, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 01, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 23, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 23, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: February 23, 2021ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: February 23, 2021REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: July 09, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (PRE RJI)
Date: April 27, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 23, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 23, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: July 09, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 28, 2023CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 21, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 28, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 28, 2023OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: May 01, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: July 19, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: July 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 28, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1) Affirmation in Reply and Word Count Verification |
||
July 19, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
July 18, 2023 | AFFIRMATION | ||
May 01, 2023 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
April 28, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion-SJ Liability |
||
April 28, 2023 |
CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) (Motion #1) Motion Printing Specifications Statement |
||
April 28, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) EX A-S&C |
||
April 28, 2023 |
STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #1) Statement of Material Facts |
||
April 28, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) EX C-REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM |
||
April 28, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) EX B-ANSWER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.