Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Autumn J. Weikel, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Perry, Edward Beacham, against Tristan P. Weikel, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, NY, . Madison County, NY Superior Courts with Donald F Cerio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonald F Cerio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 04, 2020 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMadison County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2021 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
August 24, 2021 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW | ||
August 16, 2021 | Hearing |
PRE-JUDGEMENT CERIO, JR. (Court Activity) Held Judge: HON. DONALD F. CERIO, JR. |
|
August 09, 2021 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) | ||
August 09, 2021 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW (PROPOSED) | ||
July 26, 2021 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE CERIO, JR. (Prelim. Conference) Held Judge: HON. DONALD F. CERIO, JR. |
|
March 30, 2021 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE CERIO, JR. (Prelim. Conference) Held Judge: HON. DONALD F. CERIO, JR. |
|
March 24, 2021 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
March 23, 2021 | PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
February 23, 2021 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.