Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Americu Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Shaw, Amanda C, against Christopher Clifton, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, NY, . Madison County, NY Superior Courts with Donald F Cerio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonald F Cerio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 01, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMadison County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 01, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 13, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 30, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 04, 2021 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
November 04, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
October 15, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ORDER |
||
October 13, 2021 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
October 08, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing a Copy of the Summons |
||
October 08, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Attorney Affidavits |
||
October 08, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS | ||
October 08, 2021 | EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
October 08, 2021 | RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION | ||
December 30, 2020 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.