Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
John Doe, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Demore, Timothy J, Dysert, Phillip David, against Cazenovia Central School District, By And Through Its Agents, Officers, And Or Employees, represented by Facciponte, Giancarlo, Miller, Frank William, Murphy, Thomas John, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, NY, . Madison County, NY Superior Courts with Christopher P Baker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher P Baker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 09, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Child Victims Act |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMadison County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 15, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 06, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: September 22, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
September 15, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT LETTER FROM COURT |
||
September 06, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF CONFERENCE |
||
August 23, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
August 09, 2022 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY | ||
August 04, 2022 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION | ||
August 04, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #2) Attorney's Reply Affidavit and Exhibit |
||
August 04, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #2) Stipulation of Settlement between Warner and District |
||
August 04, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) Contents of Student File |
||
August 04, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Deposition Transcript of Charles Read taken September 23, 2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.