Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Rasbach125 Realty Llc, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Gavett, Katherine E., Macleod, Kevin R., Speno, Rebecca Michele, against Lenox Town, Lenox Town Board Of Assessment Review, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, NY, . Madison County, NY Superior Courts with Donald F Cerio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonald F Cerio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management82 days |
Filing DateJuly 03, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
|
Filing LocationMadison County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
|
Case Cycle Time307 days |
PETITION
Date: July 03, 2019STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) *Corrected*
Date: May 11, 2020ANSWER
Date: August 30, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2020 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
May 15, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 11, 2020 |
STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) *Corrected* Stipulation of Settlement for filing - already signed by Hon. Donald Cerio, J.S.C. on May 5, 2020 |
||
May 05, 2020 | Hearing |
PRE-SETTLED CERIO, JR. (Court Activity) Judge: HON. DONALD F. CERIO, JR. |
|
February 27, 2020 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
February 27, 2020 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) CERIO, JR. (Motion Part) Judge: HON. DONALD F. CERIO, JR. |
|
January 23, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 23, 2020 | STATEMENT OF INCOME AND EXPENSES | ||
November 15, 2019 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 23, 2019 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE CERIO, JR. (Prelim. Conference) Judge: HON. DONALD F. CERIO, JR. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.