Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Mtglq Investors Lp, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Gallo, David A, Knuckles, Mark R., Manfro, Jordan Jayce, against Booth Alan Estate, Booth Alan R Estate, Internal Revenue Service, Nw York State Dept Of Taxation & Finance, in the jurisdiction of Madison County, NY, . Madison County, NY Superior Courts with Donald F Cerio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonald F Cerio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 03, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMadison County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: April 12, 2022COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: December 03, 2018REFEREE REPORT OF SALE
Date: May 13, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2022 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
May 13, 2022 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
April 12, 2022 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
August 19, 2021 | Notice of Pendency | ||
July 09, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE |
||
December 03, 2018 | COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.