Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, As Trustee For Morgan Stanley Abs Capital I Inc. Trust 2003-Nc8, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Katz, Jordan S, Leopold, Saul O, Oezcan, Sakine, Weber-Cantrell, Jaclyn Ann, against Americredit Financial Services, Inc, Capital One Bank, Donald Zielinski, Jerica Close, John Doe #1 Through John Doe #12,, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Livingston County, NY, . Livingston County, NY Superior Courts with Craig J Doran presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCraig J Doran Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2017 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1087 days |
Filing LocationLivingston County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 12, 2017ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #01)
Date: March 12, 2020COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: January 11, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2021 | Hearing |
Foreclosure Master Calendar - FMC
Judge: Doran, Hon. Craig J. |
|
October 01, 2021 | Hearing |
(Motion #002) Foreclosure Special Term - FST Judge: Doran, Hon. Craig J. |
|
October 01, 2021 | Hearing |
Foreclosure Settlement Conference Part - FSC
Judge: Doran, Hon. Craig J. |
|
September 17, 2021 | Hearing |
Foreclosure Master Calendar - FMC
Judge: Doran, Hon. Craig J. |
|
September 16, 2021 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT 000934-2017 Foreclosure Settlement Conf Notice for 10.1.21 |
||
August 25, 2021 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #002) Foreclosure Special Term - FST Judge: Doran, Hon. Craig J. |
|
August 25, 2021 | NOTICE OF REJECTION | ||
August 24, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
August 24, 2021 | SUR-REPLY | ||
August 24, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #02) Answer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.