Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Ally Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Mombrea, Julia Claire, against John Doe, Shaikh M Ahmed, in the jurisdiction of Livingston County, NY, . Livingston County, NY Superior Courts with Thomas E Moran presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas E Moran Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 24, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedJuly 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLivingston County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Case Cycle Time39 days |
ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: October 29, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 14, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 14, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ALEENA AHMED |
||
April 14, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SHAIKH M AHMED |
||
November 02, 2020 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #01) Replevin Order |
||
October 29, 2020 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
October 29, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 07, 2020 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
September 24, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
September 24, 2020 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) | ||
September 24, 2020 | RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
September 24, 2020 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.