Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Federal National Mortgage Association Fannie Mae A Corporation Organized And Existing Under The Laws Of The United States Of America, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Di Caro, John A, against Diane Fulcher A K A Diane M. Fulcher A K A Diane Hodziewich A K A Diane M. Hodziewich, Discover Bank, Elizabeth Jaris, John Fulcher A K A John L. Fulcher, Karl Jaris, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Livingston County, NY, . Livingston County, NY Superior Courts with Dennis S Cohen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis S Cohen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 28, 2016 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLivingston County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time125 days |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: July 06, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 06, 2016COMPLAINT
Date: October 28, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2017 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 15, 2017 |
REFEREE REPORT OF SALE Report of Sale; Notice of Sale; Affidavit of Publication; Affidavit of service by Mail; Terms of sal Report of Sale; Notice of Sale; Affidavit of Publication; Affidavit of service by Mail; Terms of sal ... show more |
||
September 15, 2017 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
July 11, 2017 | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | ||
July 11, 2017 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #002) Cohen (Motion Part) Judge: Cohen, Hon. Dennis S. |
|
July 11, 2017 | Hearing |
Decided Cohen (Court Activity) Judge: Cohen, Hon. Dennis S. |
|
July 10, 2017 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #002) Cohen (Motion Part) Judge: Cohen, Hon. Dennis S. |
|
July 10, 2017 | Motion |
(Motion #002) Decided: 07/11/2017Decided Before Justice: Cohen, Hon. Dennis S. Answer demanded: No Judge: Cohen, Hon. Dennis S. |
|
July 06, 2017 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affirmation in Support of Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale |
||
July 06, 2017 |
EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Proposed Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale Redacted per 22 NYCRR Proposed Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.