Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Credit Acceptance Corporation, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Garbus, Mark A, Jordan, Tarah Eve, against Brian O Delvalle, in the jurisdiction of Livingston County, NY, . Livingston County, NY Superior Courts Livingston County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLivingston County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court HouseLivingston County Supreme Court |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 08, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 11, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
September 19, 2022 | DEFECT CHECKLIST | ||
September 15, 2022 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
September 15, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted |
||
September 15, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR NON MILITARY Redacted |
||
September 15, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted |
||
September 15, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
||
March 08, 2020 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
March 08, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT 3AA90354239 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.