Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Einstein, Stephen, against Jennifer Malboeuf, in the jurisdiction of Livingston County, NY, . Livingston County, NY Superior Courts Livingston County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 06, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions77 days |
Filing LocationLivingston County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseLivingston County Supreme Court |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 06, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: August 28, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 09, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 04, 2020 | JUDGMENT | ||
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER Transmittal Sheet |
|
March 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Credit agreement, Terms and Conditions |
|
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFECT CHECKLIST | |
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION | |
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS | |
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR | |
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF | |
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) SEA#349563 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.