Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case against Tammy L Barnhardt, in the jurisdiction of Livingston County, NY, . Livingston County, NY Superior Courts with Robert B Wiggins presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert B Wiggins Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2017 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLivingston County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Case Cycle Time201 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 09, 2018RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: June 20, 2018NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 09, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2018 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
July 09, 2018 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
July 09, 2018 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 09, 2018 | Hearing |
Discontinued Wiggins (Court Activity) Judge: Wiggins, Hon. Robert B. |
|
June 25, 2018 | Hearing |
Wiggins (Court Activity)
Judge: Wiggins, Hon. Robert B. |
|
June 20, 2018 |
RJI -RE: OTHER General case assignment |
||
January 19, 2018 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - TAMMY L BARNHARDT |
||
January 19, 2018 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM |
||
January 16, 2018 | Hearing |
Wiggins (Court Activity)
Judge: Wiggins, Hon. Robert B. |
|
January 11, 2018 | NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.